L&M Companies, Inc. v. Biggers III Produce, Inc. d/b/a Charlotte's Finest Produce et al
Plaintiff: L&M Companies, Inc.
Defendant: Biggers III Produce, Inc. d/b/a Charlotte's Finest Produce, Howard R Biggers, III and Donald Burnette
Case Number: 3:2008cv00309
Filed: July 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Agriculture Acts Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/13/2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 74 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of CH Robinson, Brooks Tropicals and Virginia Produce; granting 78 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of D&T Brokerage; granting 88 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of L&M Companies, Greenline, and Poppell; granting 90 Biggers IV Motion for Relief from 7/16/08 and 8/3/09 Orders and Vacating the Transfer of Property; denying as moot 102 Young's Truck Center's Motion to vacate or intervene; den ying as moot 110 D&T Brokerage's Motion to Compel; granting 122 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of Bushman. Magistrate Judge's Order denying Biggers' motion to set aside entry of default is affirmed. DEFAULT JUDGMENT against D efendants Biggers and Charlotte's Finest, jointly and severally, for- CH Robinson ($44,429.75), Brooks Tropicals ($6,348.91), and Virginia Produce ($18,907.44); for D&T Brokerage ($47,594.38, plus attorneys fees in the amount of $18,280.16); for L&M Companies ($65,520.70), Greenline Foods ($10,013.93), and Poppell ($13,362.83); for Bushmans ($30,696.74)- all with postjudgment interest pursuant to 28 USC 1961 and reasonable attorneys' fees. P rejudgment interest awarded at the rate of 1.5% per month, except as to Greenline. Prejudgment interest is awarded to Greenline at the rate of 2% per month. Prejudgment interest shall accrue on the due date provided in each unpaid invoice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 4/9/10. (gpb)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Strike insofar as Biggers seeks to assert pro se claims for the corporate Defendant Charlotte's Finest; denying 89 Motion to Set Aside Default and for Leave to File Answer within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/8/09. (gpb) Modified text on 2/19/2010 and linked to doc no 96 (com).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Katy Koestner Esquivel for L&M Companies, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/20/2009. (klg)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER that counsel for the parties shall appear for a Status and Discovery Hearing on 7/13/2009, separate notice shall be issued confirming date, time and location of the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/1/2009. (klg)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/5/2009. (klg)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Bruce W. Akerly for D&T Brokerage, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/15/2008. (apb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L&M Companies, Inc. v. Biggers III Produce, Inc. d/b/a Charlotte's Finest Produce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&M Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Scott Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biggers III Produce, Inc. d/b/a Charlotte's Finest Produce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard R Biggers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?