National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. Jose Trucking Corp. dba G & P Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, Transportation Insurance Company, American Casualty Co. of Reading, PA and Continental Casualty Company
Defendant: Jose Trucking Corp. dba G & P Contractors, Inc. and G & P Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00231
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Parties to file Joint Stipulation of Dismissal not later than 5/21/10 or bring this action into full compliance with the district court's briefing Orders not later than 5/28/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/20/10. (gpb)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct Pretrial Odder and Case Management Plan; granting 29 Motion for Attorney Fees. Hearing scheduled for 2/17/2010 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/4/2010. (tmg)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adding 27 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Amend the Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan to the calendar for February 17, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/3/10. (gpb)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that counsel for parties shall appear before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell in Courtroom #2, Asheville NC on 2/17/2010 to address issues of exhibits that have not been filed and compliance with Orders of the Court regarding a briefing schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/19/2010. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford et al v. Jose Trucking Corp. dba G & P Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transportation Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Casualty Co. of Reading, PA
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Trucking Corp. dba G & P Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G & P Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?