United States Financial Litigation v. Marko

Plaintiff: United States Financial Litigation
Defendant: Bruce Howard Marko
Case Number: 3:2009cv00515
Filed: December 2, 2009
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Default of Student Loan
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss Writ of Continuing Garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/24/2011. (tmg)
December 9, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Writ of Garnishment as to Care Credit, LLC for Defendant Bruce Howard Marko, MD, Writ issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/8/10. (gpb)
January 15, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Bruce Howard Marko. Judgment entered in the amount of $7,283.00, with interest as stated in this judgment, and costs in the amount of $350.00, plus any future costs. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk, on 1/14/10. (gpb) Modified on 1/15/2010 to correct docket text(gpb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Financial Litigation v. Marko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Financial Litigation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Youngs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Howard Marko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?