Dumas v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Dumas
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. and Gloria Dumas
Case Number: 3:2010cv00420
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Richard Voorhees
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/1/2011. (tmg)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 and 20 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John R. Ipsaro and Megan Beth Gramke for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/25/2011. (tmg)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 and 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Patty Ann Trantham, Barrett Beasley for Gloria Dooms. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/5/2010. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumas v. Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Dumas
Represented By: Gregory Lawing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Dumas
Represented By: Gregory Lawing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?