June 5, 2017 |
Filing
723
ORDER granting 721 Motion to Vacate the Judgment of Invalidity for Improper Inventorship of United States Patent No. 6,385,594 and United States Patent No. 6,611,816 entered on the docket at Docket Entries 571 and 598. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/5/17. (clc)
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing
701
ORDER that LendingTrees supersedeas bond in the amount of $140,000 is APPROVED; FURTHER ORDERED that Execution of the Clerks Taxation of Costs re 699 is hereby STAYED pending LendingTrees appeal of this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/13/2015. (eef)
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing
697
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 686 Motion for Disallowance of Zillow's Costs; denying 691 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/27/2015. (eef)
|
January 13, 2015 |
Filing
694
ORDER granting 690 Motion to Stay Execution of Second Amended Judgment Pending Appeal and Approve Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/13/2015. (eef)
|
December 16, 2014 |
Filing
685
SECOND AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/16/2014. (eef)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
671
ORDER directing pltf. to submit under seal affidavit or declaration under penalty of perjury identifying atty. & paralegal hours billed to pltf. since 1/10/14. Affidavit or declaration to be fld. not later than 10/30/14.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/28/2014. (ttl)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing
667
ORDER granting 666 Motion to Seal Document Relating to NexTag's Brief Regarding Reasonableness of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/16/2014. (jlk)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing
600
ORDER granting 599 Motion for a New Briefing Schedule. Re: 577 , 584 Motion for Attorney Fees - Defendant's Amended Brief in Support due by 5/13/14 Plaintiff's response to Motions for Attorney Fees due by 6/13/2014; Re: 581 , 582 Motion for Sanctions - Plaintiff's response due by 6/13/14; Defendant's reply to Motions for Sanctions due by 6/23/14. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/2/2014. (tmg)
|
April 29, 2014 |
Filing
598
CLERK'S AMENDED JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Jury Verdict dated 3/12/14 (document #565)and the Court's Orders dated 3/31/14 (documents #569 & #570). Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns.(clc)
|
April 21, 2014 |
Filing
589
ORDER granting 576 Consent MOTION to Seal Document re Motions for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/21/2014. (eef)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
571
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/12/2014 and 3/31/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
|
February 20, 2014 |
Filing
551
ORDER granting 545 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jonathan Marina for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/20/2014. (eef)
|
February 11, 2014 |
Filing
539
ORDER granting 535 Consent MOTION to Seal Document Submissions Regarding Doctrine of Equivalents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/11/2014. (eef)
|
February 10, 2014 |
Filing
532
ORDER granting 528 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Bruce Colbath for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/10/2014. (eef)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
513
ORDER granting 509 Consent Motion To File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/7/2014. (eef)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
499
ORDER granting 498 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stephen C. Crenshaw for Nextag, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/4/2014. (eef)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing
497
ORDER granting 491 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew Mueller for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/3/2014. (eef)
|
January 29, 2014 |
Filing
479
ORDER granting 477 Joint MOTION to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/29/2014. (eef)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing
476
ORDER granting 471 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Todd R. Gregorian for Adchemy, Inc. and Zillow, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/28/2014. (eef)
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing
462
ORDER granting in part 461 Motion to Compel. Defendant Zillow, Inc. shall file a response on or before 12:00pm, January 29, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/24/2014. (chh)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing
459
ORDER granting 458 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Saina S. Shamilov for Adchemy, Inc. and Zillow, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/13/2014. (eef)
|
December 27, 2013 |
Filing
455
ORDER granting 450 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/27/2013. (tmg)
|
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
448
ORDER denying 441 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial; denying 442 Motion for Joinder; Further Ordered that for administrative purposes the Court sua sponte continues trial in this matter from January 27, 2014, to February 10, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/16/2013. (eef)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing
440
ORDER granting 439 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James W. Geriak for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/10/2013. (blf)
|
December 6, 2013 |
Filing
438
ORDER granting 426 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff LendingTree, LLC shall produce the requested documents on or before December 13, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/5/2013. (tmg)
|
November 19, 2013 |
Filing
429
ORDER granting 424 Consent Motion To File Under Seal And Supporting Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/18/2013. (eef)
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing
425
ORDER granting 423 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David A. Randall for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/18/2013. (eef)
|
November 15, 2013 |
Filing
422
ORDER granting 421 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Darren Franklin for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/15/2013. (eef)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
420
ORDER granting 419 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Martin Randall Bader for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/2013. (eef)
|
November 4, 2013 |
Filing
415
ORDER granting 404 Consent MOTION to Seal Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/4/2013. (eef)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing
401
ORDER granting 384 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/15/2013. (eef)
|
October 1, 2013 |
Filing
383
ORDER granting with modification 348 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/30/2013. (eef)
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing
381
ORDER granting 380 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kevin Andrew Lake for Nextag, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/18/2013. (eef)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing
358
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 350 Motion for Reconsideration.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/6/2013. (tmg)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
346
ORDER denying 345 Motion for Reconsideration re 344 Sealed Document, except as set forth herein allowing Plaintiff until noon on Friday, August 30, 2013, to comply with the order on NexTags motion to compel. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/27/2013. (eef)
|
August 23, 2013 |
Filing
341
ORDER granting 338 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/22/2013. (tmg)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing
336
ORDER granting 325 Motion to Compel Discovery Against Plaintiff LendingTree, LLC; denying as moot 334 Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Discovery; FURTHER ORDERED that LendingTree, LLC reimbur se NexTag, Inc. for its reasonable fees and expenses associated with filing Document Nos. 325 and 327 on or before August 30, 2013; FURTHER ORDERED that a report on mediation shall be filed on or before 8/30/2013; FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for dispositive and Daubert motions is extended to 9/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/8/2013. (eef)
|
June 26, 2013 |
Filing
326
ORDER granting 324 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/25/2013. (eef)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing
322
ORDER granting 321 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/18/2013. (eef)
|
June 13, 2013 |
Filing
320
ORDER denying 315 Motion For Leave To Depose Trip Jendron On June 21, 2013, Or Shortly Thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/13/2013. (eef)
|
May 23, 2013 |
Filing
313
ORDER granting 311 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Carolyn Chang for Adchemy, Inc. and Zillow, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/23/2013. (eef)
|
May 1, 2013 |
Filing
301
ORDER granting 300 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Laura M. Burson for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/1/2013. (eef)
|
April 18, 2013 |
Filing
299
ORDER granting 297 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Paul W. Garrity for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/18/2013. (eef)
|
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
295
ORDER granting 294 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Elizabeth J. White for Adchemy, Inc. and Zillow, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/12/2013. (eef)
|
March 1, 2013 |
Filing
283
ORDER granting 282 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2013. (tmg)
|
February 26, 2013 |
Filing
280
ORDER granting 277 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/26/13. (bsw)
|
February 15, 2013 |
Filing
274
ORDER granting 273 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert D. Spendlove for Nextag, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/15/2013. (eef)
|
February 6, 2013 |
Filing
269
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 224 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/6/2013. (eef)
|
January 23, 2013 |
Filing
257
ORDER granting 255 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/23/2013. (eef)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
253
ORDER granting 252 Motion to Seal 251 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Infringement Contentions Against Zillow, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/9/2013. (eef)
|
January 3, 2013 |
Filing
249
ORDER re 234 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/3/2013. (eef)
|
December 21, 2012 |
Filing
245
ORDER granting 244 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/21/12. (bsw)
|
December 12, 2012 |
Filing
242
ORDER denying as moot 236 Motion to Seal; granting 237 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/12/2012. (eef)
|
December 10, 2012 |
Filing
240
ORDER granting 235 Consent Motion To File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/7/2012. (eef)
|
October 29, 2012 |
Filing
229
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 226 Motion to Strike ; granting 227 Motion For Leave To Rely On Its Currently Filed Memorandum Of Law; Defendants shall file a response to LendingTrees Motion To Compel Discovery. (Document No. 224), on or before November 13, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/29/2012. (eef)
|
October 4, 2012 |
Filing
223
ORDER that the parties are hereby DIRECTED to prepare and submit an Amended Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan in accordance with the NCWD Local Patent Rules. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/3/2012. (eef)
|
June 7, 2012 |
Filing
213
ORDER granting 211 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added George Kanabe for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/7/12. (com)
|
June 5, 2012 |
Filing
209
ORDER, (Hearing resumes 6/27/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.), Motions terminated: 204 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Under 35 USC Section 101, 207 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendants' Motion to Exceed Word Limitation.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/4/2012. (eef)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
202
ORDER granting 197 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edward V. Anderson for LendingTree, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/30/2012. (eef)
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing
190
ORDER granting 188 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Thomas Garten for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/13/12. (com)
|
April 12, 2012 |
Filing
186
ORDER re 125 Patent Claim Construction Brief,,,,, 129 Patent Claim Construction Brief. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/12/12. (clc)
|
January 11, 2012 |
Filing
175
ORDER granting 174 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nelson Kuan for Nextag, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/12. (chh)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing
157
ORDER directing Clerk to schedule for Status and Motion hearing on Wed., Oct. 26, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/21/2011. (bsw)
|
September 14, 2011 |
Filing
154
ORDER granting 153 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edward Daniel Robinson for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/13/11. (gpb)
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting 123 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendant and Counterclaimant LeadPoint, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/20/11. (gpb)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
120
ORDER granting 119 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/20/11. (com)
|
May 10, 2011 |
Filing
118
ORDER granting 114 Motion to Seal Document Counterclaimants' Opposition to LendingTree's Motion to Dismiss Walker Process Fraud Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/10/2011. (tmg)
|
April 13, 2011 |
Filing
98
ORDER granting 97 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/13/2011. (tmg)
|
March 29, 2011 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/29/2011. (tmg)
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
86
Joint Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/22/11. (com)
|
January 26, 2011 |
Filing
77
JOINT AGREEMENT ON DISCOVERY. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/26/11. (gpb)
|
January 24, 2011 |
Filing
75
CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/24/11. (gpb)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Bradley Allen Waugh for Nextag, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/23/10. (gpb)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Ryan A. Tyz for Adchemy, Inc., Ryan A. Tyz for Zillow, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/26/10. (gpb)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Bobbie J. Wilson for Quinstreet Media, Inc. and Quinstreet, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/21/10. (gpb)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added David O. Taylor for Leadpoint, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/19/10. (gpb)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing
8
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Winslow B. Taub for LendingTree, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/13/10. (gpb)
|