Lee Construction Company of the Carolinas, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lee Construction Company of the Carolinas, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich Services Corporation and James A. Scott & Sons, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00539
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 174 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/6/2012. (eef)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 171 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/26/2012. (eef)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 156 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/15/2012. (eef)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 148 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/14/2012. (eef)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Stay Pending Disposition of Post Trial Motions. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/31/12. (com)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the May 17, 2012 jury verdict. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 5/17/12.(clc)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Seal 116 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Trial Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/2/2012. (eef)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/20/2012. (tmg)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 101 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/22/12. (bsw)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/12/2012. (tmg)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/24/12. (com)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER to Extend Deadlines. Motions due by 2/24/2012. Mediation deadline set for 3/16/2012. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/11/2012. (tmg)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 68 Motion to Quash subpoenas - depositions to be rescheduled and completed no later than 1/13/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/20/2011. (bsw)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/21/11. (gpb)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to file updated Certification of Initial Attorney's Conference and proposed discovery plan on or before July 1, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/17/11. (gpb)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part as to Plaintiff's eighth through twelfth claims and denying without prejudice in part. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/14/11. (gpb)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/31/11. (gpb)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Motion to file under Seal 2/7/09 email referened in complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/6/11. (bsw)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/18/2011. (bsw)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER re 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant James A. Scott & Son Response to Complaint due 12/28/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/23/10. (gpb)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Benjamin E. Nicholson, V for Lee Construction Company of the Carolinas, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/12/10. (gpb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee Construction Company of the Carolinas, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Construction Company of the Carolinas, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Graham Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Scott & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?