Bank of America, N.A. v. Old Republic Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv00553
Filed: November 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting 480 Motion to Seal; granting 482 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/23/2014. (eef)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting 476 SEALED MOTION For Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/20/2014. (tmg)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting 433 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/11/14. (ssh)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting 428 Motion for Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/5/2014. (eef)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting 422 Motion to Seal Document Unredacted Brief in Opposition to Old Republic Insurance Company's Motion to Compel 30(b)(6) Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/2/2014. (tmg)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting 416 Motion to Seal Response to Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Selected Coverage Claims [Chavez Loan] Pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/30/2014. (eef)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting 404 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 407 Motion to Seal; granting 409 Motion to Seal; granting 411 Motion to Seal; granting 413 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/27/2014. (eef)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting 400 Motion to Seal Document; Removing Document from Public Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/23/2014. (tmg)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting 391 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Exhibit D to Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/22/2014. (eef)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting 389 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Karen M. Borg for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/14/2014. (eef)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting 385 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/13/14. (tmg)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER granting 381 , 382 , and 383 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Robert C. Deegan, Benjamin R. Fliegel for Bank of America, NA,added Connor T. Gants for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/12/2014. (tmg)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting 371 , 372 and 374 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Julie Rodriguez Aldort,James Andrew Morsch and Ira J. Belcove for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/5/2014. (eef)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting 365 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/2/2014. (tmg)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting 362 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/25/2014. (eef)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER sua sponte for the scheduling of a Judicial Settlement Conference. ( Settlement Conference set for 6/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/16/2014. (eef)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting 354 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/9/2014. (eef)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting 280 Motion for Administrative Relief Regarding Improper Offsets for Claim Payments. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/11/2014. (eef)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER that the parties are directed to participate in a Judicial Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/6/2014. (blf)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting 277 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR A DECLARATION THAT OLD REPUBLIC IS PRECLUDED FROM USING EXTRINSIC EVIDENCE TO ALTER THE POLICYS TERMS. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/6/2014. (eef)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting 344 Motion to for leave to file confidential materials under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/24/2014. (eef)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 2/12/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/22/2014. (eef)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER, ( Status Conference re-set for 1/21/2014 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/19/2013. (eef)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting 328 Motion to Seal 269 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/7/2013. (eef)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER, ( Status Conference re-set for 12/10/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/2/2013. (eef)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER ( Status Conference set for 12/11/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/26/2013. (eef)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting 314 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief and Supporting Documents for Administrative Relief under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/24/2013. (eef)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 297 Motion for Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/19/2013. (eef)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting 292 MOTION to Seal Document Stipulation Regarding Bellwether Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/17/2013. (eef)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting 272 Motion to Seal Document (Defendant's Motion For Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/16/2013. (eef)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting 267 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/4/2013. (eef)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER ( Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/26/13. (bsw)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 192 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 198 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 200 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 206 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 207 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/22/2013. (tmg)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER on the Courts own motion re Notice of Hearing on Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/19/2013. (eef)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER affirming Magistrate's Ruling on Motions to compel and for protective order re 255 Objection. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/23/13. (bsw)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting 254 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/18/2013. (eef)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 231 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/1/2013. (eef)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting 217 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/13/2013. (eef)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 205 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/18/2013. (eef)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 197 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/15/2013. (eef)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 190 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/12/2013. (eef)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 188 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Douglas C Rawles for Bank of America, NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/11/13. (ssh)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Evy Marie Wild for Bank of America, NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/15/2013. (eef)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/12/2013. (eef)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 156 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/31/2013. (eef)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 152 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Catherine Eleanor Isely for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/24/2013. (eef)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 138 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/14/2013. (eef)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 135 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/2013. (eef)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying without prejudice 126 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 127 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/4/2013. (eef)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/14/2012. (tmg)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jennifer M. Bisenius for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/19/2012. (eef)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mary Christine Oppedahl for Bank of America, NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/17/2012. (eef)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Melissa Anne Meth for Bank of America, NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/16/2012. (eef)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 104 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew David Rosso for Bank of America, NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/4/2012. (eef)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Cristina Martell Shea for Bank of America, NA. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/26/2012. (eef)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/30/2012. (eef)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re 91 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/17/2012. (eef)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Albert E. Fowerbaugh, Jr for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/10/2012. (blf)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Seal Reply in Support of Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/5/2012. (tmg)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/27/2012. (tmg)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 69 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/12/12. (com)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ursula A Taylor for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/3/12. (chh)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Amber Finch for Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/16/11. (gpb)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/7/2011. (tmg)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Robert N. Hermes for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/8/10. (gpb)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Jason Daniel Maertens for Old Republic Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/7/10. (gpb)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Paul Walker-Bright for Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/17/10. (gpb)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added David E. Weiss for Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/16/10. (gpb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Meredith J. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?