Foreman v. Charlotte School of Law (NC) Inc et al

Plaintiff: Todd Montgomery Foreman
Defendant: Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Infilaw Corporation, Shirley Fulton, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Dennis Archer, Richard Inatome, Dennis Stone, Chidi Ogene, Renee Hill, Denise Spriggs, Carla Boles, Malik Edwards, Briana Urbina, Jane Doe, John Doe, Sterling Partners, Leslee Williams-Potter and Amber Holt
Case Number: 3:2011cv00098
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 48:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2011 42 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Dennis Archer, Carla Boles, Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Jane Doe, John Doe, John/Jane Doe, Malik Edwards, Todd Montgomery Foreman, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Infilaw Corporation, Chidi Ogene, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Sterling Partners, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina, Leslee Williams-Potter (Alexander, Mason)
April 25, 2011 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Dennis Archer, Carla Boles, Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Jane Doe, John Doe, John/Jane Doe, Malik Edwards, Todd Montgomery Foreman, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Infilaw Corporation, Chidi Ogene, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Sterling Partners, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina, Leslee Williams-Potter (Alexander, Mason)
April 19, 2011 40 5th Amendment by Todd Montgomery Foreman re: 15 Amended Complaint (tmg)
April 19, 2011 39 RESPONSE re 34 Answer to Complaint, by Todd Montgomery Foreman. (tmg)
April 19, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER denying 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/19/2011. (tmg)
April 19, 2011 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to 34 Answer to Complaint by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Responses due by 5/6/2011. (tmg). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 14, 2011 36 NOTICE of Service by Publication by Todd Montgomery Foreman (tmg)
April 14, 2011 35 Exhibit by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Exhibits to 15 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 57, # 2 Exhibit 58, # 3 Exhibit 59, # 4 Exhibit 60, # 5 Exhibit 61, # 6 Exhibit 62, # 7 Exhibit 63) (tmg) (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/15/2011) (tmg).
April 14, 2011 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. (chh) Modified on 4/14/2011 to change text. Plaintiff served by email, not US Mail(chh).
April 13, 2011 34 Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, and Fourth Amendments thereto, by Dennis Archer, Carla Boles, Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Malik Edwards, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Infilaw Corporation, Chidi Ogene, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Sterling Partners, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina, Leslee Williams-Potter.(Kingston, Margaret)
April 8, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER denying 30 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/ImmediateTemporary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/8/2011. (tmg)
April 4, 2011 32 Exhibits by Todd Montgomery Foreman re: 15 Amended Complaint (bsw)
April 4, 2011 31 4th Amendment by Todd Montgomery Foreman re: 15 Amended Complaint, (bsw)
April 4, 2011 30 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/immediate temporary injunction by Todd Montgomery Foreman.Responses due by 4/21/2011. (bsw)
March 31, 2011 29 Exhibits by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Exhibits to 15 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39, # 2 Exhibit 40, # 3 Exhibit 41, # 4 Exhibit 42, # 5 Exhibit 43, # 6 Exhibit 44, # 7 Exhibit 45, # 8 Exhibit 46, # 9 Exhibit 47, # 10 Exhibit 48, # 11 Exhibit 49, # 12 Exhibit 50, # 13 Exhibit 51)(chh)
March 31, 2011 28 Third Amendment by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Addendum to 15 Amended Complaint, (chh)
March 30, 2011 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc. served on 3/30/2011. (tmg)
March 30, 2011 26 Exhibit by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Exhibit 38 to 15 Amended Complaint (tmg)
March 28, 2011 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Sterling Partners served on 3/28/2011, answer due 4/18/2011. (tmg)
March 28, 2011 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Infilaw Corporation served on 3/28/2011 (tmg)
March 28, 2011 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc served on 3/25/2011. (tmg)
March 28, 2011 22 Second Amendment by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Addendum to 15 Amended Complaint (tmg)
March 23, 2011 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Denise Spriggs served on 3/11/2011, answer due 4/1/2011. (tmg)
March 23, 2011 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Dennis Stone served on 3/14/2011, answer due 4/4/2011. (tmg)
March 23, 2011 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Richard Inatome served on 3/18/2011, answer due 4/8/2011. (tmg)
March 23, 2011 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. Henry Ramsey, Jr served on 3/14/2011, answer due 4/4/2011. (tmg)
March 23, 2011 17 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Dennis Archer, Carla Boles, Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Malik Edwards, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Infilaw Corporation, Chidi Ogene, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina, Leslee Williams-Potter. (tmg)
March 23, 2011 16 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Sterling Partners. (tmg)
March 23, 2011 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dennis Archer, Carla Boles, Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Jane Doe, John Doe, Malik Edwards, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Infilaw Corporation, Chidi Ogene, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina, Leslee Williams-Potter, Sterling Partners, filed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. (tmg)
March 21, 2011 14 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Chidi Ogene. (tmg)
March 21, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER denying 4 Motion to Consolidate Service of Process; Order denying 7 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re: 3/7/2011 Text Order on Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/21/2011. (tmg)
March 16, 2011 12 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Carla Boles, Malik Edwards, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Leslee Williams-Potter. (tmg)
March 15, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc answer due 4/20/2011; Infilaw Corporation answer due 4/20/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/15/2011. (bsw)
March 15, 2011 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. as presider. District Judge Richard Voorhees no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(bsw)
March 15, 2011 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Mary Kingston on behalf of Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Infilaw Corporation (Kingston, Margaret)
March 15, 2011 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint by Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Infilaw Corporation. (Alexander, Mason). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 7, 2011 8 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Dennis Archer, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina. (tmg)
March 7, 2011 7 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Todd Montgomery Foreman re: 3/7/2011 Text Order on Motion to Seal (tmg)
March 7, 2011 Featured Case TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying 2 Motion to Seal Text of Order: Plaintiff's motion fails to state sufficient basis for sealing any of the matters referenced in his complaint. The motion is denied. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on March 7, 2011. (DSC)
March 1, 2011 Case reassigned to District Judge Richard Voorhees as presider. District Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case - conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(bsw)
February 28, 2011 6 Summons Issued Conventionally as to All Defendants. (tmg)
February 28, 2011 5 Request to Receive Electronic Notification by Todd Montgomery Foreman. (tmg)
February 28, 2011 4 MOTION to Consolidate Service of Process by Todd Montgomery Foreman. (tmg)
February 28, 2011 3 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Reference List (available to Dennis Archer, Carla Boles, Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc, Jane Doe, John Doe, John/Jane Doe, Malik Edwards, Todd Montgomery Foreman, Shirley Fulton, Renee Hill, Amber Holt, Richard Inatome, Infilaw Corporation, Chidi Ogene, Henry Ramsey, Jr, Denise Spriggs, Dennis Stone, Briana Urbina, Leslee Williams-Potter)
February 28, 2011 2 MOTION to Seal Redacted Items by Todd Montgomery Foreman. (tmg). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
February 28, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number CHD010706), filed by Todd Montgomery Foreman. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, Part 2, # 2 Exhibits, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foreman v. Charlotte School of Law (NC) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Montgomery Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte School of Law (NC), Inc
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Represented By: Mason Gardner Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infilaw Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Represented By: Mason Gardner Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Fulton
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Ramsey, Jr
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Archer
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Inatome
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Stone
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chidi Ogene
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Hill
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Spriggs
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Boles
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malik Edwards
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briana Urbina
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Partners
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslee Williams-Potter
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Holt
Represented By: Margaret Mary Kingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?