Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. The Burroughs Wellcome Fund et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York and Wilmington Trust Company
Defendant: Equity Investment Fund Pooled Trust, Treasurer of the State of North Carolina Index, First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company, Walter E. Graham, Anne G. Taylor, Glaxo Wellcome Inc., Florida Power Corp. Non-Qual, The Burroughs Wellcome Fund, Scott Schoedler, Dorothy D. Park, T. Rowe Price, Progress Energy Service Co., Donald F. Ray, Mark Hianik, Lindsay McCutcheon, IV, TCTS-Sanibel Captiva Trust Co., Fifth Third Bank, Treasurer of the State of North Carolina, John F. Mangan, Jr., Cherry Jackson Sveen and John T. McCutcheon, III
Case Number: 3:2011cv00266
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Deborah Jill Newman for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/17/2011. (tmg)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael D Carter for Walter E. Graham,Michael D Carter for Anne G. Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/18/11. (bsw)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Mitchell Hurley for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/27/2011. (tmg)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/22/2011. (tmg)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Matthew H. Farmer for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/14/2011. (tmg)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 11 , 12 , 13 , 14 , 15 , 16 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added David Zensky, Daniel H. Golden, Stephen M. Baldini, Angeline L. Koo, James P. Chou, Jason L. Goldsmith for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas; Wilmington Trust Company; Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/13/2011. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. The Burroughs Wellcome Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Investment Fund Pooled Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of the State of North Carolina Index
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter E. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne G. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxo Wellcome Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Power Corp. Non-Qual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Burroughs Wellcome Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Schoedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy D. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Rowe Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Energy Service Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hianik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay McCutcheon, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCTS-Sanibel Captiva Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of the State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Mangan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Jackson Sveen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. McCutcheon, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Daniel H. Golden
Represented By: James P. Chou
Represented By: Stephen M. Baldini
Represented By: Jason L. Goldsmith
Represented By: Angeline Lam Koo
Represented By: Mark Raymond Kutny
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Debenture Trust Company of New York
Represented By: Stephen M. Baldini
Represented By: James P. Chou
Represented By: Daniel H. Golden
Represented By: Jason L. Goldsmith
Represented By: Angeline Lam Koo
Represented By: Mark Raymond Kutny
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Stephen M. Baldini
Represented By: James P. Chou
Represented By: Daniel H. Golden
Represented By: Jason L. Goldsmith
Represented By: Angeline Lam Koo
Represented By: Mark Raymond Kutny
Represented By: David M. Zensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?