US Airways, Inc. v. US Airline Pilots Association

Plaintiff: US Airways, Inc.
Defendant: US Airline Pilots Association and Michael J. Cleary
Case Number: 3:2011cv00371
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order 97 ORDER denying 93 Motion to Vacate the Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 6/13/2014. (tmg)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order 92 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated January 11, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. USAPA shall report to the Court by 5 p.m. on October 4, 2011, by sworn affidavit, the methods used to effect the notice described in this Order to all USAPA-represented pilots, and furnish to the Court copies of all notices required to be furnished to the Plaintiff under the Courts Order.Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/28/11. (gpb)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order 51 ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/17/2011. (bsw)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Brian O'Dwyer for Michael J. Cleary and US Airline Pilots Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/12/11. (gpb)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Patrick J. Szymanski for US Airline Pilots Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/9/11. (gpb)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice -Mark Robertson. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/29/11. (com)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Airways, Inc. v. US Airline Pilots Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Airways, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Reed Marcus
Represented By: Charles Bailey King, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan P Heyl
Represented By: Michael McGuinness
Represented By: Mark Wayne Robertson
Represented By: Robert Alan Siegel
Represented By: Fred M. Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airline Pilots Association
Represented By: John West Gresham
Represented By: Zachary Richard Harkin
Represented By: Brian O'Dwyer
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Szymanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Cleary
Represented By: John West Gresham
Represented By: Zachary Richard Harkin
Represented By: Brian O'Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?