Wilson v. SunTrust Bank et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Wilson
Defendant: SunTrust Bank, Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., Residential Funding Company, LLC, Hutchens, Senter, Britton, PA and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2011cv00580
Filed: November 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/5/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER setting hearing for 68 ( Oral Argument set for 2/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/21/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 55 Memorandum in Support of Motion, defendants are ordered to file an amended motion with the required word count within 24 hours. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/7/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail)(com)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that defendant Hutchens, Senter, Britton, PA file an answer within 7 days. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/28/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/23/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(com)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. SunTrust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Christina Rampey Hunoval
Represented By: Julia Bright Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Rampey Hunoval
Represented By: Julia Bright Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC
Represented By: Joycelyn Jeanette Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchens, Senter, Britton, PA
Represented By: J. Scott Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?