Mead v. Gaston County Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Michael Mead
Defendant: Gaston County Police Department, North Carolina State Bureau of Investigations, William J. Farley, James W. Buie, Calvin Shaw, Christopher Reynolds, Christie L. Rhoney, Reginald Bloom, Christopher Haskett, William E. Howell, William Sampson, Christopher McAulay, Matthew Hensley, J. K. Shaw, William Galloway, Clyde Putnam, J. D. Costner, Mark Stewart, Renee Mullis, John Doe, Jane Doe and Doe Bond Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv00132
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/16/2017. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that additional briefing be submitted by both parties solely about the claims for trespass and malicious prosecution against the Defendants in their individual capacities. Defendants memorandum due by April 10, 2017. P laintiffs response deadline will be 10 days from the date the Defendants memorandum is submitted. Defendants reply deadline will be 5 days from the date the Plaintiffs response is submitted. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/30/2017. (eef)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated January 25, 2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER denying 155 Defendants' Motion to Stay Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/14/15. (ssh)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying 135 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 06/16/2015. (jlk)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 109 Motion to Quash by Eddie Meeks; denying 110 Motion to Quash by William Stetzer. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/24/2015. (tmg)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED ORDER, the Courts order granting in part and denying in part Defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings 90 is hereby amended to remove any portion of the order indicating that Gaston County was dismissed from the suit altogether. Gaston County remains a proper defendant in the case as to Claims IV and V. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/23/2015. (jlk)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER terminating as moot 96 Motion to Quash; terminating as moot 97 Motion to Quash; granting 104 Motion to Withdraw previously filed motions to quash without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/12/2014. (jlk)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER finding as moot 88 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/6/2013. (blf)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Defendant Gaston County is hereby dismissed. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/1/2013. (tmg)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Motion concerning grand jury proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/12/2013. (blf)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Seal Document - autopsy report of decedent Lucy Johnson. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/18/2012. (bsw)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER approving stipulation of parties as set forth, Amended Complaint due by 5/18/2012, Answer deadline extended to 7/17/2012. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/15/12. (bsw)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER approving stipulation of parties as set forth, Amended Complaint due by 5/11/2012, Answer deadline extended to 6/10/2012. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/24/2012. (bsw)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added attorney Matthew Niemiec for Michael Mead. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/11/2012. (tmg)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE denying 29 Motion to Dismiss and transferring the action to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 02/27/2012.(bshr, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 2/28/2012.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mead v. Gaston County Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mead
Represented By: Matthew R. Niemiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaston County Police Department
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina State Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Angel Evon Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Farley
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Buie
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Shaw
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Reynolds
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie L. Rhoney
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Bloom
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Haskett
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Howell
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sampson
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McAulay
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hensley
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. K. Shaw
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Galloway
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Putnam
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Costner
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stewart
Represented By: Martha Raymond Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Mullis
Represented By: Angel Evon Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Angel Evon Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Angel Evon Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Bond Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?