Kargarian v. Auto Zone
Plaintiff: Mohammad M. Kargarian
Defendant: Auto Zone
Case Number: 3:2012cv00144
Filed: March 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/8/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss; affirming 38 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/3/2012. (blf)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/22/2012. (blf)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER administratively denying as moot without prejudice 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/4/2012. (blf)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon which Relief can be Granted (Responses due by 5/18/2012.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 05/01/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John Gordon Howard for Auto Zone. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/23/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kargarian v. Auto Zone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad M. Kargarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Zone
Represented By: Harrison Andrew Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?