Moore v. USA
Petitioner: Ronald Anthony Moore
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2012cv00152
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 27 Motion for letter of recommendation (Pro se litigant served by US Mail). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/21/2013. (blf)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/11/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (blf)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying in its entirety Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), a Writ of Coram Nobis, and a Writ of Audita Querela. DENIED as to the relief sought under § 2241 as to the 2003 conviction and decision is WITHHELD as to the §2241 claim on the 2000 conviction, and supplemental briefing shall be submitted. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/22/2013. (blf)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 12 Amended MOTION to Vacate 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Alternative 2241; Alt Coram Nobis; Alt Audita Querela, ( Reply due by 2/8/2013). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/25/13. (bsw)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Petitioner shall file his Amended Petition, limited to signing such under the penalty of perjury, within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/27/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Anthony Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?