Pisano et al v. Bartlett et al
Plaintiff: North Carolina Green Party, Nicholas Triplett, Al Pisano and North Carolina Constitution Party
Defendant: Ronald G. Penny, Gary O. Bartlett, Larry Leake, Robert Cordle and Charles Winfree
Case Number: 3:2012cv00192
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/1/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (blf)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 40 Motion rule 56(d), hearing to be scheduled at later date on 36 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/18/2012. (blf)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 05/10/2012. (blf)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER regarding exhibits. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 05/08/2012. (blf)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Robert Milton Bastress, Jr. for Al Pisano and North Carolina Constitution Party. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/3/2012. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pisano et al v. Bartlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald G. Penny
Represented By: Susannah Porter Holloway
Represented By: Susan Kelly Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary O. Bartlett
Represented By: Susan Kelly Nichols
Represented By: Susannah Porter Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Leake
Represented By: Susan Kelly Nichols
Represented By: Susannah Porter Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cordle
Represented By: Susannah Porter Holloway
Represented By: Susan Kelly Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Winfree
Represented By: Susannah Porter Holloway
Represented By: Susan Kelly Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Green Party
Represented By: Jason Eskwith Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Triplett
Represented By: Jason Eskwith Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Pisano
Represented By: Jason Eskwith Huber
Represented By: Robert Milton Bastress, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Constitution Party
Represented By: Jason Eskwith Huber
Represented By: Robert Milton Bastress, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?