LAC La Belle Amie Vineyard & Winery, LLC et al v. Calcareous Vineyards, LLC
Plaintiff: LAC La Belle Amie Vineyard & Winery, LLC, La Belle Amie, LLC and Charles Vicki Weigle
Defendant: Calcareous Vineyards, LLC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00316
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Seal Document 53 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/4/2013. (blf)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Seal Document re: 50 Sealed Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/26/13. (bsw)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/8/13. (bsw)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Striking 37 Response, 32 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts. A hearing on the parties' pending Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. Nos. 21, 23) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 28) set for Wednesday, May 29, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/15/2013. (tmg)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Cheryl L. Hodgson for Calcareous Vineyards, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/30/12. (com)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAC La Belle Amie Vineyard & Winery, LLC et al v. Calcareous Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAC La Belle Amie Vineyard & Winery, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Belle Amie, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Vicki Weigle
Represented By: Matthew J. Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calcareous Vineyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?