Theodore v. Goins et al

Plaintiff: Ngando Theodore
Defendant: Elliott E. Goins, Jr., Barry M. Gullet and Curtis W. Walton, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00809
Filed: December 6, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file amended complaint by 11/27/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/13/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
November 1, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 6 , 10 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion to Strike; the Plaintiff's § 1983 Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as against all Defendants except the City of Charlotte an d all claims except for his FMLA claim against the City; granting 15 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/1/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
October 17, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/17/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
February 27, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating Cases for Trial. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:12cv809. Member Case: 3:12cv834 to be administratively closed. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/26/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theodore v. Goins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ngando Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott E. Goins, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry M. Gullet
Represented By: Daniel Edward Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis W. Walton, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Edward Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?