Randall v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Jamar Seron Randall
Case Number: 3:2013cv00154
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). Court declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/15/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
July 15, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/15/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
September 2, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) and the government is DIRECTED to reoffer the First Plea Agreement by tendering such agreement to present counsel of record in United States v. Randall, 3:10cr174. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/29/2014. (eef)
September 15, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing 23 Motion to Enter a Straight Up Guilty Plea. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/15/2014. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Melissa L. Rikard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jamar Seron Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.