United States of America et al v. Sowell et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and State of North Carolina
Defendant: James Richard Sowell and James Richard Sowell, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00203
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena and to Modify Production of Documents. Movant Sidewinder, LLC is directed to fully comply with the Subpoena as soon as possible, but no later than August 12, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/28/2015. (eef)
April 20, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Reconsideration, The deadlines in this case are revised as follows: Expert Reports - June 10, 2015; Rebuttal Reports - June 26, 2015; Discovery Completion - July 10, 2015; Mediation Report - July 20, 2015; Dispositive Motions - August 5, 2015; Trial- November 2, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 04/20/2015. (jlk)
March 23, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel Defendants' Discovery Responses; granting 44 Motion for modification of scheduling order; granting 45 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint, Amended Complaint due on or before 03/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 03/23/2015. (jlk)
July 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER (Governing Personally Identifiable Health Information). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/24/2013. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Sowell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Donald H. Caldwell, Jr.
Represented By: Paul B. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Stacy M. Race
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Richard Sowell
Represented By: Eric H. Cottrell
Represented By: James Curtis Lesnett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Richard Sowell, M.D.
Represented By: Eric H. Cottrell
Represented By: James Curtis Lesnett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?