James-Bey v. Stancil
Plaintiff: Terrance L. James-Bey
Defendant: Renoice E. Stancil
Case Number: 3:2013cv00386
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 71 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 72 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/16/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 03/09/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brj)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Finholt terminated. Petitioner's 41 Motion to Lift Stay, Motion to Disqualify Counsel, Motion for Recusal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART . The Motion to Lift Stay is GRANTED. The Motion to Dismiss Counsel is DENIED as moot. The Motion for Recusal is DENIED. Petitioner's Supplemental 42 Motion for Recusal is DENIED.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/14/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mitchell P. Reich terminated; denying 24 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mitchell P. Reich terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/8/18. (clc)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER dismissing 18 Motion for the Court to exercise Article Three (3) authority to dissolve, dismiss and quash all criminal matters related to TERRANCE LAMONT JAMES; dismissing 19 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/4/18. (clc)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mitchell P Reich for Terrance L. James-Bey; granting 15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Mitchell P Reich for Terrance L. James-Bey. Attorney Frederick Liu terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/11/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing 6 Motion to Dismiss ; dismissing 7 Motion to Lift Stay and dismissing 8 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/10/16. (ssh)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Frederick Liu for Terrance L. James-Bey; granting 2 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/13/2013. (blf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James-Bey v. Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renoice E. Stancil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance L. James-Bey
Represented By: Sarah Jessica Farber
Represented By: Frederick Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?