Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Banc of America Mortgage Securities, inc. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00447
Filed: August 6, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/3/18. (tob)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Appoint Distribution Agent. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/18/2016. (chh)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Appoint A Tax Administrator. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/21/2015. (chh)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Banc of America Mortgage Securities, inc.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/25/2014. (eef)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Stay, and Proceedings are stayed until November 20, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/14/2014. (eef)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Stay Proceedings, stayed until 10/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/25/2014. (jlk)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER affirming and adopting 29 Memorandum and Recommendations; Defendant's 30 Objection is Overruled; denying without prejudice 14 Motion to Dismiss as to reasserting such arguments at the appropriate time in the form of a Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/19/2014. (tmg)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 29 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief filed by Banc of America Mortgage Securities, inc., Bank of America, N.A., M errill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., ( Oral Argument set for 6/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/8/2014. (chh)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 15 , 16 , 17 , 18 , 19 and 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amy L. Gelder,Boris Bershteyn,Charles F. Smith,John K. Carroll, Amy J Greer, Terence M. Healy for Banc of America Mortgage Securities, inc., Bank of America, N.A. and Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/8/2013. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Mark Eric Harrison
Represented By: M. Graham Loomis
Represented By: Kristin Beth Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Mortgage Securities, inc.
Represented By: Kenneth D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?