Kona Ice, Inc. v. Hunt

Defendant: Jeremy Bryan Hunt
Plaintiff: Kona Ice, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00502
Filed: September 6, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pending Defendants completion of his Chapter 13 plan, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE( Show Cause Hearing set for 9/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.). Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/26/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 31, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/31/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)
August 4, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Order on Motion to Compel, 26 Declaration, on or before September 1, 2014, Defendant shall pay directly to Plaintiffs counsel the sum of $1,750.00 representing the reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred in filing Plaintiff Kona Ices Motion to Compel (document #23). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/04/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
July 25, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brett A. Schatz for Kona Ice, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/10/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kona Ice, Inc. v. Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bryan Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kona Ice, Inc.
Represented By: Tamara L. Huckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?