Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd et al v. CTL Packaging USA Inc et al

Plaintiff: Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd and Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc
Defendant: CTL Packaging USA Inc and Tuboplast Hispania
Counter_claimant: CTL Packaging USA Inc
Counter_defendant: Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd and Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00569
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PRETRIAL SCHEDULE granting 323 Joint Motion for Order on Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/11/16. (tob)
July 12, 2016 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 178 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 180 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 182 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 184 Motion in Limine; denying 186 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion ; granting 196 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 203 Motion ; denying 208 Motion. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/12/2016. (chh)
May 23, 2016 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants are to make available their expert, Cynthia Smith, for a deposition not to exceed three(3) hours at a date, time, and place agreed to by the parties. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/20/16. (tob)
April 22, 2016 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 301 Motion for Leave for Sana Chaudhry to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc. ; granting 302 Motion for Leave for Michael Milea to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/22/16. (tob)
March 30, 2016 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 286 Motion to continue Motions hearing. The motions hearing previously scheduled for April 13, 2016 is RESCHEDULED for May 4 2016, at 2:00pm, in Asheville during the regular Asheville Motions Calendar. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/30/2016. (chh)
March 25, 2016 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to calendar the following motions for oral argument on the next available Charlotte civil motions day re 184 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions by Expert Witness Stephen Driscoll, 196 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of United States Patent No. 6,547,094, 208 MOTION to Exclude Certain Purported Expert Testimony of Cynthia Smith and Tim Osswald , 178 MOTION for Summary J udgment as to Indefiniteness, 203 MOTION to Exclude Purported Expert Testimony of Cynthia Smith , 182 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement, 198 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of United States Patent No. 8,518,318, 190 MOTION to Exclude Certain Purported Expert Testimony of Tim Osswald and Mukerrem Cakmak , 212 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re 176 Orde r on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief , 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Enablement, 186 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Certain Testimony by Expert Witness Michael Rubinstein, 214 Sealed Document,,. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/25/16. (clc)
February 9, 2016 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 159 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/9/16. (tob)
February 8, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 155 Motion for Relief from Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/8/16. (tob)
September 8, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Compel. Within thirty days of this Order, Plaintiffs shall produce all such responsive documents in their control and in Zestrons possession, and designate an individual to be deposed; denying as moot 131 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/8/2015. (eef)
August 10, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael Wu for Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd, Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/07/2015. (jlk)
July 13, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Amended Infringement Contentions, Plaintiffs may now submit their proposed supplemental amended Infringement Contentions. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 07/13/2015. (jlk)
March 24, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. It is further ORDERED that this case be referred to Magistrate Judge Cayer for the entry of an appropriate Utility Patent Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/23/2015. (tmg)
September 29, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 MOTION for Hearing / Claim Construction Hearing Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4.6, ( Markman/Claim Construction Hearing set for 11/12/2014 08:45 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/29/14. (tob)
September 25, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Damon C. Andrews for Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd,Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd and Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/24/2014. (eef)
June 9, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kripa Raman for Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd,Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd and Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/9/2014. (eef)
March 3, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion to Compel Supplementation of Plaintiffs' Local Patent Rule 3.1 Disclosures and Stay Defendants' Local Patent Rule 3.3 Invalidity Contentions; Further Ordered that within fifteen (15) days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall submit an updated certification of initial attorneys conference and discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/3/2014. (eef)
November 19, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/18/2013. (eef)
October 16, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kara Lacy Boyle for CTL Packaging USA Inc., and Tuboplast Hispania. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/15/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd et al v. CTL Packaging USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: William S O'Hare, Jr
Represented By: Dana Vallera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: William S O'Hare, Jr
Represented By: Dana Vallera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: William S O'Hare, Jr
Represented By: Dana Vallera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTL Packaging USA Inc
Represented By: Kara Lacy Boyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christine Holleman Dupriest(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Russ Ferguson
Represented By: Barry J. Herman
Represented By: Kurt E. Lindquist, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuboplast Hispania
Represented By: Kara Lacy Boyle(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christine Holleman Dupriest(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Russ Ferguson
Represented By: Barry J. Herman
Represented By: Kurt E. Lindquist, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CTL Packaging USA Inc
Represented By: Russ Ferguson
Represented By: Barry J. Herman
Represented By: Kurt E. Lindquist, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Viva Healthcare Packaging HK Ltd
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: William S O'Hare, Jr
Represented By: Dana Vallera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Viva Healthcare Packaging Ltd
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: William S O'Hare, Jr
Represented By: Dana Vallera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Viva Healthcare Packaging USA Inc
Represented By: Anthony T. Lathrop
Represented By: Deborah S Mallgrave
Represented By: Catherine Nyarady
Represented By: William S O'Hare, Jr
Represented By: Dana Vallera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?