Carriker v. Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service et al

Plaintiff: Phillip Duane Carriker
Defendant: Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Treasury and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2014cv00154
Filed: April 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/13/17.
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Substitute Party. Estate Of Phillip Duane Carriker added. Phillip Duane Carriker terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Motion for Attorney Fees and Extension of Time to File Declaration of Cost. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/8/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated November 23, 2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/5/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carriker v. Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Duane Carriker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?