Smith et al v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Douglas R Smith, Mary Luczak-Smith, DRS Family Management, LLC, Fortis Capital Holdings, LLC, Smith Clovis Capital Holdings, LLC, Clovis Capital Ventures, LLC and Smith and Sons Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Avery Chapman, Taryn Hartnett and Chapman Legal Group
Case Number: 3:2014cv00238
Filed: May 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting 196 Motion Extend Response and Reply CMO Deadlines, Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Case Management Plan (document #185) is extended to September 15, 2015, and Plaintiffs reply deadline is extended to September 22, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 09/01/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER that Defendants' Oral Motions (made at the July 15, 2015 hearing) to Withdraw the following Motions for Summary Judgment re 89 , 91 , 93 and 95 are granted without prejudice ; Defendants' Motion for Summ ary Judgment as to the RICO claims asserted against Defendant Taryn Hartnett 89 will be ruled on by separate Order; deferring ruling on 83 Motion for Sanctions ; deferring ruling on 122 Motion to Strike ; deferring ruling on 128 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/26/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER approving 187 the parties Joint Stipulation to Extend Deposition Deadline of Douglas R. Smith. It is further ordered that, as stipulated by the parties, if settlement conversations prove unsuccessful, that Plaintiff John R. Smith will complete his deposition by no later that September 1, 2015.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/21/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying as moot 143 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 08/04/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery, Trial. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:14-cv-238 only. Member Case: 3:15-cv-262 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 07/17/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 126 Motion for Enlargement of word limit to Motion for Summary Judgement Replies. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/24/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 145 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Allan S. Reiss for Marcus Sowinski.Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 06/23/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying without prejudice 88 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 98 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 06/16/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 60 Motion to Quash; denying 65 Motion to Quash; denying 65 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 05/11/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 63 Motion to Compel, Plaintiff Douglas R. Smith shall appear for deposition at the time and place noticed in West Palm Beach, Florida on April 28, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 04/20/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 MOTION to Compel Attendance of Plaintiff at Deposition, Court orders expedited briefing, Plaintiffs response to Defendants Motion is due on or before April 16, 2015, Defendants reply is due on or before April 17, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 04/09/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott G. Hawkins for Avery Chapman, Chapman Legal Group, Taryn Hartnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 03/02/2015. (jlk)
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER striking 50 Motion to Quash; striking 50 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/27/2015. (eef)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Strike ; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 33 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/25/2014. (eef)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Dismiss ; denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Dismiss ; denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/14/2014. (eef)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Marquardt for Avery Chapman,Chapman Legal Group and Taryn Hartnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/4/2014. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas R Smith
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Luczak-Smith
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DRS Family Management, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortis Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Clovis Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clovis Capital Ventures, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith and Sons Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Chapman
Represented By: Mark Timothy Calloway
Represented By: Christopher Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taryn Hartnett
Represented By: Mark Timothy Calloway
Represented By: Christopher Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Legal Group
Represented By: Mark Timothy Calloway
Represented By: Christopher Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?