Matthews v. America's Pizza Company, LLC`
Plaintiff: Jonna Matthews
Defendant: America's Pizza Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00245
Filed: May 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. David M. Koller is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Jonna Matthews. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 08/04/2014. (jlk)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER and FINAL Notice to Erin Grewe and David Koller: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to 1) Associate Local Counsel, 2) File a motion pro hac vice, 3) Register for ECF at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/4/2014. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/28/2014. (eef)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Karen T. Bordelon for America's Pizza Company, L.L.C.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/22/2014. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. America's Pizza Company, LLC`
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Pizza Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles E. Johnson
Represented By: Karen T. Bordelon
Represented By: Joel Paul Babineaux
Represented By: Matthew Felton Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonna Matthews
Represented By: David M. Koller
Represented By: Erin Grewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?