Ford Motor Company et al v. Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC et al
Appellant: Lexington Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, American Home Assurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, Resolute Management, Inc., Everest Reinsurance Company, Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company, Volkswagon Group of America, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Ford Motor Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa
Appellee: Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC and Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants
Case Number: 3:2014cv00401
Filed: July 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/3/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for limited Remand to Bankruptcy Court, all furtherproceedings in this matter shall be held in abeyance until further order of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/12/2014. (jlk)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles Brittain Walther for Everest Reinsurance Company,Charles Brittain Walther for Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 09/22/2014. (jlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company et al v. Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AIU Insurance Company
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Resolute Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Everest Reinsurance Company
Represented By: J. Samuel Gorham, III
Represented By: Tony L. Draper
Represented By: Fred L. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mt. Mckinley Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Samuel Gorham, III
Represented By: Tony L. Draper
Represented By: Fred L. Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Volkswagon Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Represented By: Alice Sacks Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Kirk Gibson Warner
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: John S. Favate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Garlock Sealng Technologies LLC
Represented By: Richard Charles Worf, Jr.
Represented By: William Samuel Smoak, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley Kerns Neal
Represented By: John R. Miller, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan C. Krisko
Represented By: Ross Robert Fulton
Represented By: Albert Franklin Durham
Represented By: Garland Stuart Cassada
Represented By: Louis Adams Bledsoe, III
Represented By: Shelley Koon Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Houston
Represented By: Travis Waterbury Moon
Represented By: Trevor W. Swett, III
Represented By: Richard Steele Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?