Pilgrim's Pride Corporation v. Johnson Controls, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00502
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED ORDER adjourning trial date to allow parties to complete settlement procedures. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/1/2016. (tmg)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 39 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff is ordered to produce information within 14 days. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/14/2016. (tmg)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added Geoffrey D. Farnham for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/3/2015. (jde)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE, ( Discovery Hearing set for 6/23/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/16/2015. (eef)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Larry W. Jenkins, Jr for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 04/22/2015. (jlk)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: 14 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/19/2015. (tmg)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion For Order Directing the North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation to Provide All Investigation FIles to the Parties. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/31/2014. (tmg)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Damon J. Brinson for Johnson Controls, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 09/24/2014. (jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation v. Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Represented By: Thomas David Higgins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Damon Jeffrey Brinson
Represented By: Patrick James Cleary
Represented By: Timothy J. Mattson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?