Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's et al v. Johnson Controls, Inc.

Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Great Lakes Reinsurance Company (UK) PLC, Lexington Insurance Company, JBS USA Holdings, Inc. and Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00503
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED ORDER adjourning trial date to allow parties to complete settlement procedures. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/1/2016. (tmg)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER withdrawing without prejudice 12 Motion to Stay discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/31/2015. (jlk)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion For Order Directing the North Carolina State Bureau of Investigation to Provide All Investigation FIles to the Parties. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/31/2014. (tmg)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles R. Tuffley for Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company,Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's,Great Lakes Reinsurance Company (UK) PLC,JBS USA Holdings, Inc.,Lexington Insurance Company and Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/17/2014. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's et al v. Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Reinsurance Company (UK) PLC
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBS USA Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Represented By: Fred W. DeVore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick James Cleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?