February 11, 2021 |
Filing
234
CONSENT ORDER. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/11/2021. (eef)
|
October 22, 2019 |
Filing
226
ORDER granting 224 Motion for Stay of Execution on the Judgment and Proceedings to Enforce It and to Release Obligations of James Yuhas Under Prior Letter of Credit. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/22/19. (clc)
|
August 8, 2019 |
Filing
214
ORDER and JUDGMENT denying 183 Motion for New Trial; granting 185 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 187 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting with modification 191 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/8/19. (clc)
|
July 16, 2019 |
Filing
209
ORDER for Supplemental Briefing re: 191 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing due 7/23/2019. Defendant will have (7) days to file a response upon plaintiffs' filing. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/16/2019. (tmg)
|
January 25, 2019 |
Filing
180
ORDER, Parties will have twenty-eight (28) days from the date of entry of this order to file any post-trial motions that they wish to make, including motions regarding attorney fees. Upon the filing of such a motion, the opposing party will have fourteen (14) days to respond to the motion.( Motions due by 2/22/2019.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/24/19. (clc)
|
December 17, 2018 |
Filing
167
ORDER denying as moot 164 Motion in Limine. The trial in this matter will be pushed back towards the end of the Court's January trial period and will be tried on or after January 22, 2019. Parties are ordered to file pre-trial submissions by January 11, 2019. Any motions in limine will be due by January 14, 2019, and responses to those motions will be due by January 17, 2019. Witnesses for trial should be subpoenaed by January 8, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/17/18. (mga)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
163
ORDER to memorialize and revise this Courts oral orders given at the status conference held October 16, 2018 at 10:00AM. The trial for damages is set for the Courts mixed trial term beginning January 7, 2019. Parties are order ed to file pre-trial submissions by December 31, 2018.1 Any motions in limine will be due by December 31, 2018, and responses to those motions will be due by January 3, 2019. Witnesses for trial should be subpoenaed by December 24, 2018.( Jury Trial set for 1/7/2019 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/16/18. (clc)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
162
ORDER and NOTICE of hearing, ( Status Conference set for 10/17/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/26/18. (clc)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
159
ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 6/11/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/31/18. (clc)
|
March 21, 2018 |
Filing
156
ORDER granting 154 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/21/18. (clc)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing
136
ORDER denying 133 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/29/17. (clc)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
109
AMENDED JUDGMENT in favor of Legacy Data Access, Inc., Dianne M. Peters against Cadrillion, LLC, Legacy Data Access, LLC, James Yuhas. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/7/17. (clc)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
106
ORDER granting 87 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 90 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 92 Motion for New Trial; denying 94 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 94 Motion for New Trial; granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/19/17. (clc)
|
October 4, 2016 |
Filing
86
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 05/13/16 & 10/4/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (clc)
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing
84
ORDER, ( Jury Trial set for 10/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/8/16. (clc)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing
80
ORDER re 79 Memorandum, 78 Memorandum - The Plaintiffs are not entitled to Relief under Fed.R.Civ.P. 50(a) on the jury's finding that Defendants' conduct was not in or affecting commerce. The Plaintiffs shall notify the Court of their intention to pursue or not pursue punitive damages in this matter by filing notice on the docket within seven days from the date of this Order. The Defendants shall have 7 days from Plaintiff's filing to respond to that filing. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/2/2016. (chh)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing
64
ORDER denying 61 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/27/16. (clc)
|
April 21, 2016 |
Filing
59
ORDER denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Motions in Limine on admissibility due no later than close of business 4/26/16. All other pre-trial submissions shall be filed no later than 8pm 5/1/16. Final PTC shall be conducted on 5/3/16 at 9am. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/21/16. (clc)
|