Dugan et al v. Wiegand et al
Plaintiff: M. Dugan, Karen Dugan and The GDM Family Trust
Defendant: Phillips Wiegand, Jr., Piliana M. Schamens, David W. Schamens, Invictus Capital Growth and Income Fund, LLP, Invictus Asset Management, LLC, Invictus Income Fund, Invictus Real Estate Investment, LLP, Invictus Funds, LLC, TradeDesk Financial Group, Inc., TradeDesk Financial Corporation, TradeStream Analytics, Ltd., Invictus Capital Growth Fund, LLP, Invictus Holdings, LLP and TradeDesk Capital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00366
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 93 Pro Se Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/7/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Register Judgment Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1963. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/20/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying 70 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 4/24/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Default Judgment. Default Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiffs' and against defendants. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/30/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Stay re 46 Entry of Default Judgment by Karen Dugan, M. Dugan, The GDM Family Trust Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay Entry of Default Judgment or Dismissal until February 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/18/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Plaintiffs must file Motion for Default Judgment within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/22/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh) Modified on 7/22/2016 to add text(ssh).
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER administratively denying as moot 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/8/16. (tob)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay only for thirty(30) days from entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/4/16. (tob)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER sua sponte re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1). Plaintiffs shall file a supplemental brief on or before 1/4/16. Within 14 days of the filing of Plaintiffs' brief, Defendant may file a supplemental brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/4/15. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dugan et al v. Wiegand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Dugan
Represented By: Mark Raymond Kutny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Dugan
Represented By: Mark Raymond Kutny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The GDM Family Trust
Represented By: Mark Raymond Kutny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Wiegand, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piliana M. Schamens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Schamens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Capital Growth and Income Fund, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Asset Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Real Estate Investment, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Funds, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TradeDesk Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TradeDesk Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TradeStream Analytics, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Capital Growth Fund, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invictus Holdings, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TradeDesk Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?