Hagy v. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Amy Worley Hagy
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., ACE American Insurance Company and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2015cv00509
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion To Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery completion due August 1, 2017, Mediation/ADR due August 18, 2017; Dispositive Motions due September 1, 2017; Oral argument on MSJs due on or before October 16, 2017; and Trial scheduled for January 8, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/8/17. (mga)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 4/12/17. (ssh)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/27/16. (ssh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagy v. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Worley Hagy
Represented By: Vernon Rollins Sumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?