Lewis v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Lorraine Lewis
Defendant: Archie L. Smith, III, Kelly S. King, Jeff D. Rogers, Smith, Debnam, Narron, Drake, Saintising & Mysers and Branch Banking & Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv00606
Filed: December 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 27 Motion to Vacate. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/11/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/1/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss ; affirming 21 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/1/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Writ of Error Coram Nobis, deemed to be an Objection is OVERRULED and the Court affirms the Orders of Judge Cayer. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/4/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archie L. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly S. King
Represented By: Daniel Gerald Cahill
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff D. Rogers
Represented By: Bettie Kelley Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith, Debnam, Narron, Drake, Saintising & Mysers
Represented By: Bettie Kelley Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branch Banking & Trust Company
Represented By: Daniel Gerald Cahill
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?