Richardson v. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Norman Richardson
Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., Crawford and Company and Broadspire Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00068
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/19/2017. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/19/2017. (jaw)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that due to pending motions for summary judgment, the trial in this matter is RE-SET, ( Jury Trial set for 3/12/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/28/2017. (eef)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion to file dispositive motions and related filings under seal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/18/17. (tob)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/2/2017. (eef)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sabrina L. Atkins for Broadspire Services, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/12/2017. (eef)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's claim for Unjust Enrichment is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/9/16. (mga)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to drop Crawford & Company as a party from this action. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/18/2016. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Norman Richardson
Represented By: Michael B. Pross
Represented By: Vernon Rollins Sumwalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Represented By: S. McKinley Gray, III
Represented By: William A. Oden, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford and Company
Represented By: Jon A. Berkelhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadspire Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jon A. Berkelhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?