Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE v.D&B Marine, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE
Defendant: D&B Marine, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00280
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that the parties through counsel, advised the Court via telephone that the parties have settled this case. Pursuant to the Parties' indication that the case has settled, all proceedings in this case are hereby stayed. The Parties are ordered to provide the Court with a status report of the settlement within thirty (30) days of entry of this order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/19/2018. (brl)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying 64 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/26/2018. (jaw)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/10/2017. (eef)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Steven Eric Goldman added for Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/11/16. (mga)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added S. Scott Bluestein for D&B Marine, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/5/16. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE v.D&B Marine, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Lakes Reinsurance (UK) SE
Represented By: Louis Graham Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&B Marine, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?