Castro v. Stanton Enterprise, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Miriam Maya Castro
Defendant: Stanton Enterprise, Inc., Jeff Stanton and Ann Stanton
Case Number: 3:2016cv00830
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED ORDER re 56 Consent Judgment. Judgment is hereby entered against Defendants Stanton Enterprise, Inc., Jeff Stanton, and Ann Stanton and in favor of Plaintiff for the total sum of $5,075.64, plus prejudgment i nterest and reasonable attorneys fees; FURTHER ORDERED that Any remaining claims raised in this litigation, including those against McDonalds Corporation and McDonalds USA, LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/15/2018. (eef)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Miriam Maya Castro against McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's U.S.A., LLC, Stanton Enterprise, Inc., Ann Stanton, Jeff Stanton. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/5/2018. (eef)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Elizabeth B. McRee for McDonald's Corporation and McDonald's U.S.A., LLC; granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Alice V. Brathwaite for McDonald's Corporation and for McDonald's U.S.A., LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/22/17. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Stanton Enterprise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Maya Castro
Represented By: Carol Lee Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Enterprise, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?