Burr Potato Company, Inc. et al v. IGH Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Burr Potato Company, Inc. and Dennis and Arden Ramseyer Farms, Ltd.
Defendant: IGH Enterprises, Inc. and John R. Wilson
Case Number: 3:2017cv00247
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Consent ORDER re doc 19 (which Court construes as a Motion for Entry of a Consent Order) Hearing scheduled for 5/22/17 @ 2:00 p.m. is cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/22/17. (ssh)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Louis W. Diess, III for Burr Potato Company, Inc. and Dennis and Arden Ramseyer Farms, Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/16/17. (mga)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 3 Motion for TRO. This Temporary Restraining Order shall expire 14 days from the date and time issued, unless before that time the Court, for good cause, extends it for a like period or Defendants consent to a longer extension. Additionally, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 65(b)(4), on two days' notice to Plaintiffs, Defendants may appear and move to dissolve or modify the order. The parties are directed to TAKE NOTICE that a hearing on this Order and on Plaintiff's Motion for P.I. (doc 5) shall take place on Monday, May 22, 2017 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 1-1. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/11/2017. (chh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burr Potato Company, Inc. et al v. IGH Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burr Potato Company, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Scott Decker
Represented By: Louis William Diess, III
Represented By: John Patrick Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis and Arden Ramseyer Farms, Ltd.
Represented By: Rachel Scott Decker
Represented By: Louis William Diess, III
Represented By: John Patrick Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGH Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher P. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Wilson
Represented By: Christopher P. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?