Polanco v. HSBC Bank USA National Association et al
Plaintiff: Claudia E. Polanco
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation, 21st Mortgage Corporation, Christiana Trust and Knoxville 2012 Trust
Case Number: 3:2017cv00466
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER setting a Judicial Settlement Conference for Thursday, July 18, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Courtroom #1-5 in the Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Trade Street, Charlotte, North Carolina. The Clerk of Court shall reserve Courtroom #1-5 and it's attached conference room. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/27/19. (mga)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER the Parties to appear before the Honorable Judge David Keesler for a judicial settlement conference. The Parties are to schedule this conference with Judge Keeslers chambers as soon as practicable. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 06/18/2019. (brj)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER before this Court for a telephonic conference on June 13, 2019.As discussed at the conference, the Court enters the following Order: All outstanding deadlines in this case are extended sixty (60) days, ( Discovery due by 8/12/2019., Motions due by 8/12/2019.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/13/2019. (eef)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/20/2019. (brl)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the Jury Trial is RE-SET for 2/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/16/2018. (jaw)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/29/2018. (jaw)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Status Conference in re 18 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to 41(a)(2), ( Status Conference set for 5/29/2018 03:00 PM in Bankruptcy Courtroom 4-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/25/2018. (jaw)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent ORDER Amending Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan re 15 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan, ( Discovery due by 5/25/2018, Motions due by 6/15/2018, Mediation deadline set for 5/18/2018) All remaining deadlines shall be as set forth in the original Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/19/2018. (jaw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polanco v. HSBC Bank USA National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia E. Polanco
Represented By: James W Surane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association
Represented By: Katherine Mary Kliebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Mary Kliebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 21st Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Mary Kliebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Katherine Mary Kliebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoxville 2012 Trust
Represented By: Katherine Mary Kliebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?