Cascade Capital, LLC et al v. DRS Processing LLC
Plaintiff: Cascade Capital, LLC and Cascade Capital, LLC - Series A
Defendant: DRS Processing LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00470
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 10/24/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (brl)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re 37 Status Report. The execution of previously imposed contempt sanctions continues to be suspended. Defendants deadline to purge their contempt is no later than November 15, 2018. Plaintiffs deadline to purge its contempt is on or before December 15, 2018. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/5/2018. (jaw)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gregory Neidle for DRS Processing LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/12/2018. (brl)
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Defendant will make available to Plaintiffs counsel the contact information and all approvals necessary to enable Plaintiffs to search, access, and download the information regarding the Santander Accounts and the Santander Portfolios directly from Simplicity. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/5/2018. (eef)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that Defendant DSR Processing LLC dba Miller Stark Klein & Associates and its owner Darryl Miller are hereby found in contempt of the Courts Default Judgment Order entered January 5, 2018. On account of such contempt, the Court imposes the following sanctions; however, execution of the sanctions is suspended until after a hearing on October 2, 2018, at 10 am. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/29/2018. (jaw)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Default Judgment. The Court awards Plaintiffs requested injunctive relief as described in detail in the Order. As to Plaintiffs monetary damages, the Court reserves such questions until Defendant has produced the required information and a future evidentiary hearing may be held. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/5/2018. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cascade Capital, LLC et al v. DRS Processing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Capital, LLC
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cascade Capital, LLC - Series A
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRS Processing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?