Boyton v. Xerox Commercial Solutions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vernon Boyton
Defendant: Xerox Commercial Solutions, LLC, Affiliated Computer Services, LLC and Conduent Business Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00505
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/21/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Relief for Defamation Of Character, Slander, Libel, Negligence And Intentionally Infliction Of Emotional Distress. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/7/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MaryJo L. Roberts for Affiliated Computer Services, LLC, Conduent Business Services, LLC, and Xerox Commercial Solutions, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/18/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyton v. Xerox Commercial Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Boyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Commercial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Martineau
Represented By: MaryJo Lovie Roberts
Represented By: Crystal-Gaye Melissa Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated Computer Services, LLC
Represented By: MaryJo Lovie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conduent Business Services, LLC
Represented By: MaryJo Lovie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?