Coker v. XPO Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gene Coker
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00557
Filed: September 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; added John S. Marshall for Gene Coker. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/13/2018. (ams) (Main Document 16 replaced per chambers on 9/13/2018) (jaw).
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/13/2018. (jaw)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Edward Reilley Forman for Gene Coker. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/12/2017. (chh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker v. XPO Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Coker
Represented By: Geraldine Sumter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?