Montefusco v. Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Montefusco
Defendant: Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00666
Filed: November 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc. (Wood, Stacy)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. All pretrial deadlines are extended 60 days. Discovery due by 12/3/2018. Motions due by 1/7/2019. Mediation deadline set for 12/17/2018. Jury Trial set for 3/4/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 07/09/2018. (brl)
July 3, 2018 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Thomas Montefusco. Responses due by 7/17/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Tew, Clark). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
May 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clark Daniel Tew (Tew, Clark)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 2-3 days. Discovery due by 10/2/2018. Motions due by 11/6/2018. Mediation deadline set for 10/16/2018. Jury Trial set for 1/7/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/5/18. (tob)
January 4, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Wood, Stacy)
December 15, 2017 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/5/2018. (brl)
December 14, 2017 Filing 9 Verified ANSWER to Complaint by Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc..(Schulman, Janie)
November 22, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark Daniel Tew on behalf of Thomas Montefusco (Tew, Clark)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc. answer due 12/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/18/17. (tob)
November 17, 2017 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal by Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Wood, Stacy). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 17, 2017 Notice to jschulman@mofo.com: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/27/2017. (chh)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Janie Schulman for Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/17/2017. (chh)
November 17, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Janie F. Schulman Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3516205. by Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.. (Wood, Stacy). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
November 16, 2017 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
November 16, 2017 Filing 3 Exhibit - State Court Documents by Environmetal Systems Research Institute Inc.. Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal (Wood, Stacy) Modified text on 11/16/2017 (brl).
November 16, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Environmetal Systems Research Institute Inc. (Wood, Stacy)
November 16, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County Superior Court, case number 17-15483. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3515153), filed by Environmetal Systems Research Institute Inc..(Wood, Stacy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montefusco v. Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Montefusco
Represented By: Clark Daniel Tew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Systems Research Institute Inc.
Represented By: Stacy K. Wood
Represented By: Sarah Johnson Douglas
Represented By: Janie Fay Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?