Chenkus et al v. Prairie Pizza, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heather Chenkus and Gene Michael Christiansen
Defendant: Prairie Pizza, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00723
Filed: December 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/5/18. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (clc)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER,THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte to schedule a class action settlement fairness hearing. A hearing will be held before the undersigned on Wednesday, December 5, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. ( Settlement Conference set for 12/5/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/23/18. (clc)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Facilitate Notice of FLSA Settlement and for Preliminary Approval of Schedule and Procedure for Obtaining Final Approval of FLSA Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/16/18. (clc)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 11 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/8/18. (mga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chenkus et al v. Prairie Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Chenkus
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Michael Christiansen
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Yager Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?