Geiger et al v. H&H Franchising Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roseann Geiger and Sherri Holley
Defendant: H&H Franchising Systems, Inc., Glenkat, Inc., Kathleen Holden and Glen Holden
Case Number: 3:2017cv00738
Filed: December 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 154 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/31/2019. (nvc)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting part 147 MOTION to Continue Trial. This matter is continued from the 7/1/2019 trial setting. A revised schedule and trial setting will be determined following a status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/19/19. (tob)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 143 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Aaron-Michael Sapp for H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/5/19. (tob)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATION on 80 MOTION to Lift Stay AS TO PLAINTIFFS GEIGER, MOSS AND CARMON AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Sherri Holley ( Objections to M&R due by 6/4/2019 ); ORDER denying 100 MOTION to Compel RESPONSES TO DEPOSITION QUESTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE RELATED AFFIDAVITS FILED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/21/19. (tob)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER FOLLOWING MEDIATED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/26/19. (tob) Modified to correct on 3/26/2019 (tob).
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying as moot 89 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/8/19. (tob)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying without prejudice 85 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/7/19. (tob)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Certify Class Revised Motion to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice under 29 U.S.C. § 216(b). The original motion 44 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court approves the issuance of a notice consistent with this Order and sets the deadline for opting into this action as February 9, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/27/2018. (brl)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 55 Motion to Compel Arbitration as to all claims brought by Plaintiff Geiger and opt-in Plaintiffs Carmon and Moss, and this matter is STAYED as to those claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/20/18. (tob)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 21 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/11/18. (clc)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Marlen Cortez Morris for H&H Franchising Systems, Inc.; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Fredric A. Cohen for H&H Franchising Systems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/14/18. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geiger et al v. H&H Franchising Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roseann Geiger
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Holley
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&H Franchising Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenkat, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?