Gil et al v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Dante Gil, Rosa Gil and Ada Argueta
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, Francis Cissna and Leander Holston
Case Number: 3:2018cv00070
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Stay Court's Order issued on April 2, 2019 (Doc. No. 19 ). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/1/19. (mga)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/2/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that For the reasons stated in open court on 4/2/2019, Plaintiffs Petition for Review of the Denial of Naturalization is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are to allow Plaintiffs to refile for lawful permanent resident (LPR) status under 8 U.S.C. §1255(i). Plaintiffs have thirty (30) days from entry of this Order in which to file the required paperwork and fee. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/2/2019. (eef)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/1/2019. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gil et al v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Gil
Represented By: W Rob Heroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Gil
Represented By: W Rob Heroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ada Argueta
Represented By: W Rob Heroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leander Holston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?