Ibekwe v. Blood Oranges LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bryant Ibekwe
Defendant: Blood Oranges LLC, Crisscross Funding, Minicast LLC, Native Digital Inc., Amy Hill, Miguel Sosa, Juliet Summer Thomson, Scott Ward and James Linen
Case Number: 3:2018cv00089
Filed: February 23, 2018
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. David A. Laird is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants Blood Oranges, LLC, CrissCross Funding, Minicast LLC, Native Digital Inc., Amy Hill, and Scott Ward. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/11/18. (mga)
June 27, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher E McCall for Blood Oranges LLC, Crisscross Funding, Amy Hill, Minicast LLC, Native Digital Inc.,and Scott Ward. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/27/2018. (chh)
May 30, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. DENIED in part with regard to Defendants Amy Hill; Scott Ward; Blood Oranges, LLC; CrissCross Funding; Minicast, LLC; and Native Digit al, Inc., and GRANTED in part with regard to Defendants Miguel Sosa and Juliet Summer Thomson. The relevant portions of the Complaint against Defendants Sosa and Thomson are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/29/18. (clc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibekwe v. Blood Oranges LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Ibekwe
Represented By: Sara Salehi Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blood Oranges LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crisscross Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minicast LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Native Digital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Sosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliet Summer Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Linen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?