Paskowitz v. Capitala Finance Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Laurence Paskowitz
Defendant: Capitala Finance Corp., Joseph B. Alala, III and Stephen A. Arnall
Movant: Karen Story, Sanford B. Salzman, Darryl Ledet, Stevy Dingus and Erik Pohl
Case Number: 3:2018cv00096
Filed: March 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER adopting in part 67 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 56 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint without prejudice. If Plaintiffs choose to file a motion seeking to further amend, t hey must do so within (30) days. Plaintiffs' 60 Motion to Strike Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Bethany Rezek is granted as to Exhibits 4, 10 and 12 and denied as to Exhibit 11. If Second Amended Complaint is not filed, the Clerk is directed to close case. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 8/15/2019. (tmg)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jacob A Goldberg for Karen Story. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/16/18. (tob)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/4/18. (tob)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/20/18. (tob)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Phillip Kim for Karen Story. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/16/18. (tob)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added B. Warren Pope for Joseph B. Alala, III, Stephen A. Arnall, and for Capitala Finance Corp.; granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Bethany Marie Rezek for Joseph B. Alala, III, Stephen A. Arnall and for Capitala Finance Corp.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/8/18. (tob)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/8/18. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paskowitz v. Capitala Finance Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Paskowitz
Represented By: Gary W. Jackson
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitala Finance Corp.
Represented By: Bradley Jason Lingo
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph B. Alala, III
Represented By: Bradley Jason Lingo
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Arnall
Represented By: Bradley Jason Lingo
Represented By: B. Warren Pope
Represented By: Bethany Marie Rezek
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Karen Story
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Sanford B. Salzman
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Darryl Ledet
Represented By: Avi N Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Stevy Dingus
Represented By: Avi N Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Erik Pohl
Represented By: Avi N Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?