Johnson v. Campbell
Plaintiff: R. Keith Johnson
Defendant: Justice Harrison Campbell
Case Number: 3:2018cv00121
Filed: March 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/19/18. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (clc)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, It appearing that Defendant has tendered the amount due pursuant to the settlement approved by the bankruptcy court, the Court CONTINUES the case through and including July 9, 2018 for R. Keith Johnson, as Trustee in t he bankruptcy case and Plaintiff in the adversary proceeding, to take appropriate action to dismiss the adversary proceeding as docketed in the bankruptcy court as 17-3066 and this Court as 3:18-cv-00121.( Jury Trial set for 7/9/2018 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/3/18. (clc)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this case is CONTINUED for thirty (30) days for the reasons stated at the pretrial conference on April 30, 2018 and the Court REFERS and RETURNS the case to the Bankruptcy Court for approval of a finalized settlemen t agreement and for administration of the settlement agreement. Recognizing a continuance for more than thirty (30) days may be necessary, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice on or before May 31, 2018 informing the Court of the status of the proceedings in the Bankruptcy Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/30/18. (clc)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss. IT FURTHER APPEARS that the parties have not filed their pretrial submissions as required by the Courts March 21, 2018 Order or moved for an extension of time. The Court hereby sua sponte EXTENDS the time for the parties to file their pretrial submissions to 5:00 pm on April 26, 2018. The Court, however, notifies the parties that the failure to timely submit the pretrial submissions may result in this Court ordering the parties to show cause.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/24/18. (clc)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Docket Call set for 5/1/2018 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. Jury selection shall proceed docket call on May 1, 2018 or May 2, 2018. Counsel should be prepared to proceed to trial at the first available mixed term of court commencing after docket call. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jaw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Keith Johnson
Represented By: R. Keith Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Harrison Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?