Mode v. S-L Distribution Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jared Mode
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Distribution Company, Inc. and S-L Routes, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00150
Filed: March 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER granting 637 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael J. Puma for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Routes, LLC and Snyder's-Lance Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/27/2021. (mek)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting 609 Motion to Compel S-Ls Production of a Revised Privilege Log or Alternatively to Compel S-L to Produce 20 Documents for In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/4/2021. (mek)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER granting 624 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Erica Turners (Dkts. 1, 180-1) claims against S-L; S-Ls counterclaim against Erica Turner (Dkt. 538); S-Ls third-party claim against RVR Distribution, LLC (Dkt. 265). Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 2/25/2021. (tmg)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER denying 601 Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas to Testify and Produce Documents and for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/18/2021. (mek)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting 611 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 2/1/2021. (nvc)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER granting 605 S-L's Motion to Dismiss and orders that the following be DISMISSED with prejudice: Opt-in Plaintiff Floyd Forester's claims (Dkts. 1 , 183 ); S-L's counterclaim against Forester (Dkt. 538 ); and the Third-Party Complaint against Bella Brook, LLC (Dkt. 225 ). Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 1/28/2021. (tmg)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting 599 Motion to Compel Certain Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs' Production of Tax Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/21. (mek)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting 594 Motion to Compel Certain Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs to Provide Deposition Availability. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/16/2020. (tmg)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER granting the Unopposed 589 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/2/2020. (brl)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting 584 Joint Motion to Dismiss. S-L's counterclaim against Khuloud Aledlah, (Doc. No. 538), is dismissed with prejudice; S-L's third-party claim against E&K Snaxs LLC, (Doc. No. 448) is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/12/2020. (tmg)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting 582 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kaitlyn E. Hutcherson for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/10/2020. (mek)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting 579 Joint Motion Regarding Re-Entry into the Litigation. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/4/2020. (nvc)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER granting 556 Motion to Strike - [552-554] Motions for Summary Judgment. Beth Sturino will be dismissed from this action by agreement of the parties. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/23/2020. (nvc)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER granting 575 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric M. Makinen for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/18/2020. (mek)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting 573 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/13/2020. (nvc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting 570 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Hugh B. Bright for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/5/2020. (mek)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting 559 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Deficient Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 9/17/2020. (brl)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 547 Unopposed Motion to Compel Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs' as follows: (a) Opt-In Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A to the Motion shall produce written discovery responses an d documents responsive to S-Ls Interrogatories and Requests for Production within thirty days of this Order; (b) Opt-In Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit B to the Motion shall produce documents responsive to S-Ls Requests for Production with in thirty days of this Order; (c) Opt-In Plaintiffs are warned that failure to comply with this Order and fully respond to these discovery requests may result in their claims being DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(d) Following expiration of the thirty-day response period, S-L may submit a motion to dismiss all claims brought by and asserted against any Plaintiff who did not fully comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/3/20. (mga)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting 514 S-L's Motion to Compel Arbitration. The 255 Plaintiffs with arbitration clauses in their Distributor Agreements shall arbitrate their claims as provided in their agreements. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 4/9/2020. (tmg)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting 527 and 528 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Philip J. Pence and Christopher A. Stecher for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution, LLC and S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/11/2020. (brl)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting 525 Consented to Motion for Readmission Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin K. Jacobs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/18/2019. (mek)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 Motion Regarding Approval of Proposed Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/23/19. (tob)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 148 Motion Regarding Provision and Use of Putative Collective List by S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/16/19. (tob)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re 141 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Order on Memorandum and Recommendations. The Court now specifies that Third-Party Defendant M&M Imports, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, (Doc. No. 103), is DENIED without prejudice for the reasons already established in the Courts previous order, (Doc. No. 141). Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/29/2019. (brl)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 109 Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective.. S-L shall provide Plaintiff's counsel the last known names, mailing addresses and email address of all putative collective members. The parties shall promptly agree upon appropriate notice and opt-in forms of submission to the Court for approval. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/14/2019. (brl)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 97 Memorandum and Recommendations and 122 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting Defendant's 22 Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint. Specifically, Pl aintiff's NCWHA claim is DISMISSED; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims; denying without prejudice Third-Party Defendant's 84 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaints.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/6/2019. (brl)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting 135 Joint Motion to Dismiss and Orders that Sartis claims against S-L (Doc Nos. 1, 4); S-Ls counterclaim against Sarti (Doc. No. 25); and S-Ls third-party claims against Siempre Avanti, LLC (Doc. No. 28) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/14/2018. (jaw)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 132 and 133 Joint Motion to Dismiss. McAlister and Bayoumis claims against S-L (Doc. Nos. 1, 21) are dismissed with prejudice; S-Ls counterclaims against McAlister and Bayoumi (Doc. No. 25) are dismissed w ith prejudice; S-Ls third-party claims against McAlister Distributing Inc., a North Carolina Corporation (Doc. No. 54), and against Snack It Now, LLC, a Georgia limited liability company (Doc. No. 56), are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/29/2018. (eef)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 127 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark J. Gottesfeld for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/9/18. (tob)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added J. Chadwick Hatmaker for Jared Mode; granting 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Peter David Winebrake for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/23/18. (tob)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sari M. Alamuddin for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC,and S-L Routes, LLC; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac V ice added Paul C. Evans for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC and S-L Routes, LLC; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Benjamin K. Jacobs for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, and S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/10/18. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mode v. S-L Distribution Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Mode
Represented By: John Keith Coates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S-L Distribution Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S-L Routes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?