Shaiban et al v. Cissna et al
Plaintiff: Saleh Shaiban, Fatima Muthana, Aseel Shaiban, Tahani Shaiban, Saeed Shaiban, Amin Shaiban and Akram Shaiban
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv00153
Filed: March 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/25/19. (clc)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/25/19. (clc)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff leave to amend the complaint. Plaintiffs will have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order's entry to file an amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove the seal from the Parties' "Joint Status Report." (Doc. No. 15 ). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/8/19. (mga)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER deferring ruling on 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; deferring ruling on 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The Court hereby STAYS this matter pending the USCISs final adjudication of Plaintiffs I-485 adjustment applications. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/1/18. (clc)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Julia A. Goldberg is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Plaintiffs Fatima Muthana, Akram Shaiban, Amin Shaiban, Aseel Shaiban, Saeed Shaiban, Saleh Shaiban, and Tahani Shaiban. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/28/18. (mga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaiban et al v. Cissna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saleh Shaiban
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Muthana
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aseel Shaiban
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahani Shaiban
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saeed Shaiban
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amin Shaiban
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akram Shaiban
Represented By: Julie A. Goldberg
Represented By: Andres Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?